MD SB1007 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Education to require each public school to administer a specified test to each student before high school graduation during specified school years; requiring the State Board to develop curriculum content for a specified course in financial literacy to be taught beginning with a specified school year; requiring each county board of education to implement specified financial literacy curriculum content in specified high schools beginning with a specified school year; etc.
Title
State Board of Education - Financial Literacy Curriculum - Graduation Requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-12 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Examinations
Local Government Mandates
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Students
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Examinations
Local Government Mandates
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Students