MD SB101 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that specified retail service station dealers advertise a price of mid-grade gasoline sold on the premises; repealing an obsolete provision of law relating to the sale of gasohol; authorizing signs to state a price for specified motor fuel products sold on the premises; etc.
Title
Business Regulation - Motor Fuel Advertising Signs - Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (135-1) | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-22 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-08 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-21 | First Reading Finance |