MD SB1018 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Chestertown Rural Health Care Delivery Innovations Pilot Program in the Maryland Department of Health to promote innovative solutions for a sustainable future for inpatient care in rural areas, satisfy requirements for hospital-based care, and ensure improvements to community health; requiring the Department to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the activities and findings from the initial 5 years of the Pilot Program and certain recommendations based on those findings; etc.
Title
Health Facilities - Chestertown Rural Health Care Delivery Innovations Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-22 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {347775/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-28 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Data
Eastern Shore
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Medical Treatments
Prices
Public Health
Public Officials
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Data
Eastern Shore
Health
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Health, Department of
Hospitals
Medical Treatments
Prices
Public Health
Public Officials
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation