MD SB1033 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the chairman and treasurer of a campaign finance entity to provide electronic mail addresses of the chairman and treasurer to the State Board of Elections and notify the State Board of a change in the electronic mail addresses by a specified date if the chairman and treasurer consent to receiving specified notice only by electronic mail; etc.
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance - Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2012-03-26 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-03-26 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2012-03-27 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2012-03-17 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-17 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-23 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Campaign Financing
Elections, State Board of
Gifts
Notices
Political Committees
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Treasurers
Elections, State Board of
Gifts
Notices
Political Committees
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Treasurers