MD SB1065 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the owners of zero-emission vehicles and plug-in electric drive vehicles that are not zero-emission vehicles to pay an annual surcharge of $150 and $122.50, respectively; authorizing the surcharge to be paid in installment payments; requiring the proceeds collected from the surcharge to be deposited into the Transportation Trust Fund; and requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to refuse to register or renew or transfer the registration of a motor vehicle for failure to pay the surcharge or installments.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Registration - Annual Surcharge
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Floor Amendment 153021/1 (Senator McKay) Rejected (Y: 6 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Floor Amendment 153021/1 (Senator McKay) Rejected (Y: 6 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-16 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment {833327/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment {153021/1 (Senator McKay) Rejected (6-38) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {573829/1 Adopted |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {573829/1 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Electric Motor Vehicles
Fees
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Fees
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 11 | 125.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 11 | 145.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 13 | 956 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |