MD SB113 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Recreational License Incentive Discount Program in the Department of Natural Resources; providing the purpose of the program is to provide incentives for eligible individuals to obtain recreational fishing and hunting licenses; authorizing the Department to offer incentive discounts under the Program that may not exceed 50% of the underlying license fee and may not be offered to an individual who has held a certain license within the previous 2 years; authorizing the Department to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Recreational License Incentive Discount Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Prices
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
Fish and Fishing
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Prices
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation