MD SB116 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending to June 30, 2016 the termination of specified provisions of law authorizing the Department of Juvenile Services to transfer a child committed to residential placement from a specified facility to another facility under specified circumstances; requiring the Department of Juvenile Services to provide to the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2015 a specified report; etc.
Title
Juvenile Law - Committed Facilities - Extension of Termination Date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 135 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2014-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {582316/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-11-08 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Courts
Hearings
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Notices
Reports
Sunset
Hearings
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Notices
Reports
Sunset