MD SB122 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the use of a firearm in the commission of a felony or other crime of violence constitutes a crime of violence; expanding the list of controlled dangerous substances applicable to a certain prohibition against volume dealing; increasing maximum penalties for certain crimes; establishing the Tyrone Ray Violence Intervention and Prevention Fund to be used to support effective violence reduction strategies through grants to local communities; establishing the Task Force to Study Maryland's Criminal Gang Statutes; etc.
Title
Criminal Law – Comprehensive Crime Bill of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (36-8) (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2018-03-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary and Appropriations |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-8) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Floor Amendment {143322/2 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {108878/1 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Appeals
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Electronic Communication
Evidence
Guns
Harassment
Immigrants and Citizenship
Judges
Juries
Nonprofit Organizations
Penalties and Sentences
Perjury
Petitions
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Search and Seizure
Subpoenas
Sunset
Threats
Time
Victims
Witnesses
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Electronic Communication
Evidence
Guns
Harassment
Immigrants and Citizenship
Judges
Juries
Nonprofit Organizations
Penalties and Sentences
Perjury
Petitions
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Search and Seizure
Subpoenas
Sunset
Threats
Time
Victims
Witnesses