MD SB135 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workgroup to Study Funding for the Westernport Wastewater Treatment Facility to identify and examine existing funding sources that support the Facility and study whether increased funding could enhance operations at the Facility, the funding sources of comparable facilities in the region, and available and potential federal, State, and local funding sources for the Facility; and requiring the Workgroup to report, on or before December 1, 2024, its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly.
Title
Workgroup to Study Funding for the Westernport Wastewater Treatment Facility - Establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Arthur Ellis [D] | Sen. Mike McKay [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2024-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {793722/1 Adopted |
2024-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-10-27 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Allegany County
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
County Commissioners
Environment
Environment, Department of the
General Assembly
Health, Department of
Public Officials
Public Works
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
studies
Sunset
Wastewater
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
County Commissioners
Environment
Environment, Department of the
General Assembly
Health, Department of
Public Officials
Public Works
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
studies
Sunset
Wastewater