MD SB138 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 748
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 748
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing employees of the Baltimore County Public Library to form, join, and participate in an employee organization and engage in certain other activities related to collective bargaining; authorizing an employee organization seeking certification as the exclusive representative for the bargaining unit of employees to file a petition with the Director indicating this intent; specifying the responsibilities of the library and the certified exclusive representative; etc.
Title
Education - Baltimore County Public Library - Collective Bargaining
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 748 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-40) |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2021-03-30 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-7) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {607870/1 Adopted |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB45 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 747
Subjects
Baltimore County
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
County Executives
Discipline
Discrimination
Education - Local Bills
Elections
Fees
Fines
Libraries
Managers and Supervisors
Mediation
Petitions
Privacy
Salaries and Compensation
Strikes
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Collective Bargaining
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
County Executives
Discipline
Discrimination
Education - Local Bills
Elections
Fees
Fines
Libraries
Managers and Supervisors
Mediation
Petitions
Privacy
Salaries and Compensation
Strikes
Time
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 23 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 708 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 709 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 710 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 23 | 712 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |