MD SB139 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a certain prohibition relating to threatening to commit a certain crime of violence in order to prohibit a person from knowingly threatening to commit or threatening to cause to be committed a certain crime of violence that would place five or more people at substantial risk of death or serious physical injury if the threat were carried out; providing that a person who violates the Act is guilty of a misdemeanor and on conviction is subject to imprisonment of up to 10 years and a fine not to exceed $10,000 or both; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 31
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-03-11HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-25HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-02-22SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-02-20SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-20SenateFloor Amendment {783828/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2019-02-20SenateFloor Amendment {203920/1 (Senator Carozza) Adopted
2019-02-20SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-15SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-25SenateHearing 2/07 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-01-21SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0139&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0139f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0139t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_31_sb0139t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0139_20392001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0139_78382801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0139.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0139_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0267.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0139_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1263.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback