MD SB14 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering from June 1 to September 1 the date by which the Public Service Commission must report each year to the General Assembly on terminations of gas or electric service occurring during the previous heating season.
Title
Utility Service Protection Program - Annual Report - Deadline
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-18 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-01-17 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Klausmeier) {633421/1 Adopted |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-01-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Hearing 1/10 at 1:30 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2012-10-11 | Senate | Pre-filed |