MD SB144 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from 10% to 25%, the amount of restoration and preservation expenses for specified historic structures that the governing body of a county or municipal corporation may authorize to be claimed by specified taxpayers as a property tax credit against the county or municipal property tax; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2013; etc.
Title
Property Tax Credit - Historically and Architecturally Valuable Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2013-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2013-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-14 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Counties
Historical Matters
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Counties
Historical Matters
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property