MD SB144 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Lowering, from 21 years to 18 years, the age that a person must be to serve as a kinship parent for a child in need of out-of-home placement; and repealing a provision authorizing a local department to waive the age requirement for a potential kinship parent who is at least 18 years of age and who lives with a spouse who is at least 21 years of age.
Title
Family Law - Foster Care - Kinship Parent Age Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |