MD SB144 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Making specified provisions of law authorizing the prelitigation discovery of specified insurance coverage information relating to claims involving vehicle accidents applicable to claims involving any tort involving death or bodily injury; providing that an insurer is only required to provide a claimant with documentation of the applicable limits of coverage in a specified automobile insurance policy, homeowner's insurance policy, or renter's insurance policy; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Title
Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2017-03-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary and Economic Matters |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {448473/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {448473/1 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-16 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Accidents
Attorneys
Beneficiaries
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Disclosure
Insurance
Records
Torts
Attorneys
Beneficiaries
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Disclosure
Insurance
Records
Torts