MD SB155 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-08 - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-08 - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Video Lottery Facility Location Commission to conduct a study to assess the financial impact of offering table games, including card games, dice games, roulette, and other forms of gaming in Maryland video lottery facilities; and requiring the Commission to report to the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2013.
Title
Video Lottery Facility Location Commission - Financial Impact of Additional
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-19 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0155.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0155f.pdf |