MD SB155 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-09 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-09 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an employee of a public body from creating or maintaining government e-mail by using a personal e-mail account; requiring an employee of a public body, under specified circumstances, to forward government e-mail to the official e-mail account of the employee within 5 days after the government e-mail is received; requiring each public body to retain government e-mail for a minimum of 7 years or, under specified circumstances, permanently; requiring the State Archivist to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Title
Public Bodies - Use and Retention of E-Mail - Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-09 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Archives
Civil Actions
Electronic Government
Ethics
Public Information
Public Officials
Records
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Archives
Civil Actions
Electronic Government
Ethics
Public Information
Public Officials
Records
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Telecommunications and Information Technology