MD SB164 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 693
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 693
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the minimum interest rate from 1% to 0.15%, used to determine minimum nonforfeiture amounts for annuity contracts.
Title
Insurance – Annuities – Nonforfeiture – Interest Rate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 693 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-3) |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB119 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 692