MD SB189 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a victim's representative to be present and to provide an oral or written statement at an administrative hearing concerning a fatal vehicular accident; requiring a specified notice to a victim's representative under specified circumstances; authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to suspend for up 180 days the license of a person who is convicted of a moving violation that contributed to an accident that resulted in the death; providing that a licensee may request a hearing on a suspension; etc.
Title
Victims' Rights - Fatal Vehicular Accident - Suspension of License
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Haines [R] | Sen. Nancy Jacobs [R] | Sen. Allan Kittleman [R] | Sen. Edward Reilly [R] |
Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] | Sen. Lowell Stoltzfus [R] | Sen. Norman Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (141-0) | |
2010-04-04 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-10 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-12 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2010-04-09 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-09 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-09 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-09 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-08 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-20 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Accidents
Crimes and Punishments
Death
Drivers` Licenses
Fines
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Negligence
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Victims
Crimes and Punishments
Death
Drivers` Licenses
Fines
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Negligence
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Victims