MD SB206 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Revising, restating, and recodifying the laws of this State relating to sheriffs' salaries and expenses; clarifying language; making certain technical and stylistic changes; providing for the construction of the Act; providing for the effect and construction of certain provisions of the Act; and authorizing the publisher of the Annotated Code to make certain corrections in a certain manner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Code Revision - Courts - Sheriffs' Salaries and Expenses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196
2019-03-28SenateReturned Passed
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-26HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-25HouseFavorable Report by Judiciary
2019-03-11HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-25HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-02-22SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-02-20SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-20SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-15SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-25SenateHearing 2/06 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-01-23SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback