MD SB230 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the time at which specified professional liability insurers seeking reimbursement from the Rate Stabilization Account of the Maryland Health Care Provider Rate Stabilization Fund on behalf of specified health care providers are required to make a specified determination, send a specified notice, and apply to the Account for reimbursement; repealing specified audit requirements; altering reporting requirements; etc.
Title
Insurance - Maryland Health Care Provider Rate Stabilization Fund
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2012-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (132-0) | |
2012-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2012-03-14 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-24 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2012-04-02 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-22 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-02-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable with Amendments 297876/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-20 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Medical Malpractice
Notices
Physicians
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Occupations
Insurance
Insurance Administration
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Medical Malpractice
Notices
Physicians
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes