MD SB237 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the penalties for a person convicted for possession of a canceled, revoked, or suspended driver's license to be a fine not exceeding $500 and an assessment of 3 points.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Canceled, Revoked, and Suspended Driver's Licenses - Penalties

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-9) (Y: 126 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 493
2019-04-01SenateReturned Passed
2019-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed (126-9)
2019-03-27HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-30SenateHearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-01-30SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-25SenateHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback