MD SB237 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the Police Department of Baltimore City is an agency and instrumentality of the City of Baltimore, instead of the State; providing that police officers of the department have the authority conferred under Title 2 of the Criminal Procedure Article; requiring that a certain "no-knock" search warrant be preapproved by a certain supervisor and the State's Attorney; altering the required frequency of certain police training; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Reform
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2020-10-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB707 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-26 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Counties
Discrimination
Injury
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Police Conduct
Public Safety
Recordings
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Search and Seizure
State's Attorneys
Video
Warrants
Baltimore City
Counties
Discrimination
Injury
Law Enforcement
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Police Conduct
Public Safety
Recordings
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Search and Seizure
State's Attorneys
Video
Warrants
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 1 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 511 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 516 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 523 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore City | 16 | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Baltimore City | 16 | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0237?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0237f.pdf |