MD SB240 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the authority of the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to delegate to the Deputy Commissioner, an associate commissioner, or one other Administration employee who is designated by the Commissioner and admitted to the practice of law in the State the responsibility for holding a hearing under specified provisions of law.
Title
Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Responsibility for Holding Hearings - Delegation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-17 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {537578/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Finance |