MD SB247 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership and responsibilities of the Modernize Maryland Oversight Commission; and requiring the Department of Information Technology to provide staff for the Commission.
Title
Information Technology - Modernize Maryland Oversight Commission - Membership, Responsibilities, and Staffing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-09-13 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Cybersecurity
Reports
Standards and Best Practices
State Government - Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor, and Employment
Cybersecurity
Reports
Standards and Best Practices
State Government - Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 5 | 316 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0247?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/sb/sb0247f.pdf |