MD SB253 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting pay-for-success contracts negotiated or entered into by the Department of Natural Resources from certain provisions of the General Procurement Law.
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Pay-For-Success Contracts - Procurement Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-26 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-25 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-12 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2023-09-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB235 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Subjects
Contracts
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Procurement
Standards and Best Practices
State Government - Procurement
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Procurement
Standards and Best Practices
State Government - Procurement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 11 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 13 | 112.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |