MD SB265 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the proceedings for which a local department of social services is required to provide specified notice to preadoptive parents and foster parents of a child under specified circumstances and at which preadoptive parents and foster parents have the right to be heard; repealing a requirement that a local department of social services provide specified notice to specified relatives of a child and substituting a requirement that the local department provide specified notice to caregivers of a child; etc.
Title
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of Child
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-1) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-0) (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-0) (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-1) |
2013-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2013-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-18 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-0) |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |