MD SB269 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 652
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the policy and purpose of provisions of law governing flood control and watershed management to include establishing a grant program to assist local jurisdictions with infrastructure repairs, watershed restoration, and emergency protection work associated with a flood event; authorizing the Department of the Environment to use the comprehensive flood management grant program to award grants to subdivisions that incurred infrastructure damage of at least $1,000,000 caused by a flood event on or after January 1, 2009; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Comprehensive Flood Management Grant Program – Awards for Flood Damage and Mandatory Funding

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (107-24) (Y: 107 N: 24 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (107-27) (Y: 107 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 652
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (107-24)
2019-04-08HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-06HouseDelegates Lafferty, Cassilly, and Gaines
2019-04-06HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-06HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2019-04-05SenateSenators Peters, Griffith, and Eckardt
2019-04-05SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-05SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2019-04-05SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (107-27)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {840518/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-26HouseRereferred to Environment and Transportation and Appropriations
2019-03-20HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {659230/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-05SenateHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-05SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-29SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-28SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0269&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0269f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0269t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0269e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_652_sb0269e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0269_65923001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0269_84051801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0269_16352301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0269_68392001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0269.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0269_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0690.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0269_app.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0269_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1307.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0269_68392001.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1393.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1555.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback