MD SB280 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that the Maryland Parole Commission administer extended sexual offender parole supervision; adding specified hearings related to lifetime sexual offender supervision to the list of subsequent proceedings for which the State's Attorney is required to provide a specified notice to a specified victim or victim's representative; altering specified provisions relating to extended sexual offender supervision of specified offenders; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Offenders - Lifetime Supervision
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Motion Returned Second Reading (Pipkin) Rejected (Y: 12 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Motion Returned Second Reading (Pipkin) Rejected (Y: 12 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2010-04-04 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Delegates Dumais, Waldstreicher, and Frank | |
2010-04-01 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-01 | House Refuses to Recede | |
2010-03-30 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) | |
2010-03-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2010-03-26 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2010-04-04 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2010-04-06 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2010-04-03 | Senators Brochin, Haines, and Raskin | |
2010-04-03 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-03 | Senate Requests House Recede | |
2010-04-03 | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments | |
2010-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | |
2010-03-26 | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Pipkin) Rejected (12-30) | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-12 | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-22 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Ex-Offenders
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Judges
Juvenile Causes
Minors
Notices
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
State`s Attorneys
Victims
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Ex-Offenders
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Judges
Juvenile Causes
Minors
Notices
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
State`s Attorneys
Victims