MD SB281 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-01 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-01 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a tax credit against the motor vehicle excise tax for qualified plug-in electric drive vehicles; repealing an obsolete tax credit against the motor vehicle excise tax for qualified hybrid vehicles and electric vehicles; providing for the transfer of specified amounts from the Strategic Energy Investment Fund to the Transportation Trust Fund for specified fiscal years to offset a reduction in revenues from the vehicle excise tax credit for qualified plug-in electric drive vehicles; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Excise Tax - Tax Credit for Electric Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-03-26 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-19 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2010-04-05 | Senators Peters, Edwards, and Zirkin | |
2010-04-05 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-05 | Senate Requests House Recede | |
2010-04-05 | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-22 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Budgets
Energy Matters
Excise Tax
Governor
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicles
Revenue and Taxes
Tax Credits
Transportation
Energy Matters
Excise Tax
Governor
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicles
Revenue and Taxes
Tax Credits
Transportation