MD SB281 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 544
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 544
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to waive certain application fees for applicants intending to use certain contaminated properties for clean or renewable electrical generation sites under certain circumstances; requiring the Department to adopt certain regulations; requiring that the owner of a certain eligible property that wants to change the use of the eligible property be liable for certain fees waived under the Act under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Renewable Energy Development and Siting (REDS) – Evaluations and Tax and Fee Exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 544 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {244337/1 Adopted |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2020-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB336 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Certifications
Energy Matters
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Fees
Mining
Parking
Pollution
Real Property
Reclamation
Refuse Disposal
Renewable Energy Sources
Sediment Control
Energy Matters
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Fees
Mining
Parking
Pollution
Real Property
Reclamation
Refuse Disposal
Renewable Energy Sources
Sediment Control
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 7 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 7 | 506 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 8 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |