MD SB285 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB72
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor's Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs to conduct a study of the participation of minority-owned businesses in the alcoholic beverages industry in the State; providing for the inclusion of certain issues in the study; requiring the Office to conduct the study in consultation and cooperation with certain agencies and interests; requiring the Office to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2022; etc.
Title
Minority Participation in the Alcoholic Beverages Industry - Study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-10-30 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB285 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
HB422 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-11 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB422 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-11 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Attorney General
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Communications
Comptroller
Counties
Demographics
Human Relations
Industry and Technology
Minorities
Municipal Corporations
Reports
Retail Sales
Sunset
Transportation, Department of
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Manufacturing
Attorney General
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Communications
Comptroller
Counties
Demographics
Human Relations
Industry and Technology
Minorities
Municipal Corporations
Reports
Retail Sales
Sunset
Transportation, Department of
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0285?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0285f.pdf |