MD SB289 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 302
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the transfer of property in Allegany County on the assessment books or records until certain charges due a municipal corporation have been paid as required by law, subject to certain exceptions; and requiring the certificate of a certain collecting agent and municipal corporation to be endorsed on the deed and providing that the endorsement is sufficient authority for transfer on the assessment books.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property - Allegany County - Transfer of Property on Assessment Books

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 302
2020-03-18SenateReturned Passed
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2020-03-16HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-02-21HouseReferred Environment and Transportation
2020-02-20SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-02-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-02-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-02-17SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-01-23SenateHearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-22SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Same As/Similar To

HB678 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 301

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Real Property3104(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback