MD SB291 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation from charging specified unemployment insurance benefits against the earned rating record of an employing unit; authorizing the Secretary to find that a cause of voluntarily leaving employment is good cause if it is directly attributable to the individual or individual's spouse, minor child, or parent being a victim of domestic violence and the individual provides specified information; providing that specified information provided to the Secretary is confidential; etc.
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Coverage - Victims of Domestic Violence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 112 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (112-26) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-18 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2012-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments 567572/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-26 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Disclosure
Domestic Violence
Insurance
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Privacy
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Unemployment
Victims
Work, Labor and Employment
Domestic Violence
Insurance
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Privacy
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Unemployment
Victims
Work, Labor and Employment