MD SB301 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 286
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each administrator of a hospital to provide patients with a certain patient's bill of rights; requiring each administrator of a hospital to provide certain patients with an interpreter, a translator, or other accommodation to provide assistance to patients; requiring each administrator of a hospital to conspicuously post the patient's bill of rights on the hospital's website and in areas of the hospital accessible to patients and visitors; requiring the Department of Health to submit a certain report by January 1, 2021; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hospitals - Patient's Bill of Rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 286
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-29HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-28HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2019-03-28HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {697371/2 Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback