MD SB317 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Court of Appeals to allow an applicant for admission to the Bar or a lawyer to use a credit or debit card to pay an examination fee or other fees required for admission to the Bar and any annual fee assessed against a lawyer; and authorizing the Court of Appeals to charge a processing fee for each credit or debit card payment not exceeding the actual cost incurred in processing the credit or debit card payment.
Title
Lawyers - Fees - Payment by Credit or Debit Card
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |