MD SB323 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to consider and, as appropriate and to the extent consistent with State and federal law, use certain supplemental environmental projects as part of a settlement or enforcement action concerning an alleged violation of certain water pollution, sediment control, or water appropriation laws; requiring the Department to conduct a study to determine the level at which certain fees would need to be set and to report to certain committees of the General Assembly by December 31, 2020; etc.
Title
Environment – Supplemental Environmental Projects and Study on Discharge Permit Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-21 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Examinations
General Assembly
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Matters
Examinations
General Assembly
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 325 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |