MD SB330 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2007 to authorize the matching fund required for the Hope House project, located in Anne Arundel County, to consist of real property and funds expended prior to June 1, 2007; providing that specified grants may not terminate before June 1, 2015; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2007 - Anne Arundel County - Hope House
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |