MD SB339 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 549
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 549
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain employment with Anne Arundel Community College to be included in the calculation of State service to determine eligibility to participate as a retiree in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program; etc.
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 549 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {609334/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 9:00 a.m. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB537 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-29 - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Baltimore City
Community Colleges
Health
Health Insurance
Retirement
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
State Pensions and Retirement
State Universities and Colleges
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Baltimore City
Community Colleges
Health
Health Insurance
Retirement
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
State Pensions and Retirement
State Universities and Colleges
Time
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 2 | 509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |