MD SB340 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an establishment, with the exception of a volunteer fire department, rescue squad, or emergency medical services organization, in Calvert County that is not licensed by the Board of License Commissioners from giving, serving, dispensing, keeping, or allowing to be consumed on its premises, or on premises under its control or possession, any alcoholic beverages; establishing a penalty for violation of the Act of a fine not to exceed $10,000 or imprisonment not to exceed 2 years or both; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Alcoholic Beverages - Unlicensed Establishments - Prohibitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 292 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-17 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {754131/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Calvert County
Crimes and Punishments
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Penalties and Sentences
Rescue Squads
Volunteers
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Calvert County
Crimes and Punishments
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Penalties and Sentences
Rescue Squads
Volunteers