MD SB353 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to limit the amount a covered individual is required to pay in copayments or coinsurance for a covered prescription insulin drug to not more than $30 for a 30-day supply.
Title
Health Insurance - Prescription Insulin Drugs - Limits on Copayment and Coinsurance (Insulin Cost Reduction Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-0) |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-11 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {173122/1 Adopted |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1397 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 405
Subjects
Drugs
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Nonprofit Organizations
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Revenue and Taxes
Health - Insurance
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Nonprofit Organizations
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Revenue and Taxes