MD SB43 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (125-11)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore to require members of the command staff of the Police Department of Baltimore City, at the rank of captain or above, to reside in Baltimore City; and providing that a certain local law, ordinance, or policy enacted or adopted by the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore shall apply prospectively.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City – Members of the Command Staff of the Police Department – Residency Requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-11) (Y: 125 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (40-7) (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (125-11)
2019-04-08HouseSpecial Order until next session (Delegate Branch) Adopted
2019-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {970516/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-04-04HouseHearing 4/04 at 2:30 p.m.
2019-04-01HouseRereferred to Environment and Transportation
2019-03-26HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed (40-7)
2019-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-22SenateFavorable with Amendments {658671/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-21SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-15SenateHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-11-13SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback