MD SB431 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 174
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 174
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Charles County to use the proceeds from the issuance of certain tax increment financing bonds for convention centers, conference centers, or visitor's centers, to maintain infrastructure improvements at the centers, and to market development districts facilities and other improvements in the Waldorf Urban Redevelopment Corridor; making certain financing, refinancing, and reimbursement contingent on review and approval of the Board of County Commissioners of Charles County; etc.
Title
Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate D. Barnes) Adopted (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate D. Barnes) Adopted (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 174 |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-1) |
2020-03-16 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate D. Barnes) Adopted (131-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {955360/1 Adopted |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-03-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-28 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-28 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {169439/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB345 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 175
Subjects
Appropriations
Bonds
Budgets
Charles County
Conventions
Economic and Community Development
Public Buildings and Facilities
Revenue and Taxes
Special Taxing Districts
Tourism
Urban Areas
Bonds
Budgets
Charles County
Conventions
Economic and Community Development
Public Buildings and Facilities
Revenue and Taxes
Special Taxing Districts
Tourism
Urban Areas
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 12 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 12 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 21 | 503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 21 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Local Government | 21 | 521 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |