MD SB432 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the locations of the Cyber Warrior Diversity Program to include the University of Maryland Baltimore County Training Centers that are located in the State; specifying the amounts and uses of certain grants provided under the Program; altering the date, from November 1, 2018, to on or before December 15, 2019, and each December 15 thereafter, that certain governing entities must notify the Maryland Higher Education Commission regarding the number of students enrolled in the Program for the academic year; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - Cyber Warrior Diversity Program - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 454
2019-04-04SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-04SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {484761/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2019-03-08HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {784238/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0432&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0432f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0432t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0432e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_454_sb0432e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0432_78423801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0432_48476101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0002/sb0432.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0432_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0421.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0432_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1133.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1168.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback