MD SB447 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environmental Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-20 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environmental Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "close economic association" in the Public Ethics Law to include the client of a legislator or a client of a partnership, limited liability partnership, or limited liability corporation in which the legislator knowingly has invested capital or owns an interest; and generally relating to public ethics, members of the General Assembly, and presumptions of conflicts.
Title
Public Ethics - Members of the General Assembly - Presumption of a Conflict - Clients
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Roy Dyson [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-21 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Dyson) {853220/1 Adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {364630/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Dyson) Adopted |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {364630/1 |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |