MD SB460 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the maximum fine from $500 to $1,000 that may be imposed for a violation of provisions of the Maryland Vehicle Law regarding crosswalks; establishing the Pedestrian Safety Fund for the purpose of enhancing the safety and quality of pedestrian and bicycle transportation, including through certain educational programming for bicyclists, motorists, and pedestrians, certain physical design changes, and certain increased enforcement of existing rules of the road; etc.
Title
Pedestrian Safety Fund Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (120-14) (Y: 120 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-17) (Y: 119 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-17) (Y: 119 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (120-14) |
2019-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2019-04-06 | House | Delegates Stein, Stewart, and Ciliberti |
2019-04-06 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-06 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senators Waldstreicher, Washington, and West |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2019-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (119-17) |
2019-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {540811/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-26 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Accidents
Appropriations
Bicycles
Budgets
Comptroller
Construction
Crimes and Punishments
Education
Fines
Highways
Interest
Investments
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Operation
Pedestrians
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Treasurers
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Zoning and Planning
Appropriations
Bicycles
Budgets
Comptroller
Construction
Crimes and Punishments
Education
Fines
Highways
Interest
Investments
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Operation
Pedestrians
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation, Department of
Treasurers
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Zoning and Planning