MD SB465 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a secondary mortgage loan, or a secondary lien, shall retain the same subordinate position with respect to a mortgage or deed of trust securing a refinanced loan without requiring the agreement to the refinancing of the lender of the secondary mortgage loan, or the credit grantor of the loan secured by the secondary lien, under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Refinancing of First Mortgage Loans - Subordination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2013-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Finance |