MD SB506 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB309
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-28 - Referred Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to apply for preliminary approval of a handgun permit to wear, carry, or transport a handgun without completing a certified firearms training course; requiring the Secretary of State Police to investigate an application for a handgun permit; requiring the Secretary to issue preliminary approval if the applicant meets certain requirements except the certified firearms training course; requiring an applicant to satisfy the firearms training requirement within 120 days after receipt of preliminary approval; etc.
Title
Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
SB506 (Carry Over) 2020-02-28 - Referred Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 5 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 5 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |