MD SB52 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain planning and reporting requirements for the Strategic Energy Investment Program; requiring the Maryland Energy Administration, by December 31, 2019, to develop a plan for expenditures for fiscal year 2020 and a plan for expenditures covering the next 3 fiscal years; requiring an annual report to be provided to the Strategic Energy Investment Advisory Board and to include information on program initiatives, the status of programs and expenditures, and possible or expected future changes; etc.
Title
State Government - Strategic Energy Investment Program - Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 133 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment {133429/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Data
Energy
Energy Matters
Records
Reports
Utility Regulation
Committees and Commissions
Data
Energy
Energy Matters
Records
Reports
Utility Regulation