MD SB520 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing an exemption from the motor fuel tax for motor fuel that is bought by a county board of education or a school bus operator under contract with a county board of education for use in a school bus; authorizing a county board of education to claim a refund of a motor fuel tax paid on motor fuel purchased for use in a school bus used to transport the county's public school students; authorizing a specified school bus operator to claim a refund of a motor fuel tax paid for specified purposes; etc.
Title
County Boards of Education - School Buses - Motor Fuel Tax Exemption and Refund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397 |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {395367/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {129338/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Contractors
Counties
Education, Boards of
Fuel Tax
Motor Vehicles
School Buses
Taxes - Transportation
Washington County
Counties
Education, Boards of
Fuel Tax
Motor Vehicles
School Buses
Taxes - Transportation
Washington County